MD SB180 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, in consultation with certain groups, to develop training for certain school personnel to identify symptoms of anaphylaxis, asthma, and respiratory distress in students; requiring the Maryland Department of Health, in consultation with county boards, and authorizing nonpublic schools to establish a policy to obtain, administer, and train school personnel to administer in emergency situations bronchodilators to a student who is determined to be, or is perceived to be, experiencing certain symptoms; etc.
Title
Public and Nonpublic Schools - Bronchodilators - Use, Availability, Training, and Policies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {593028/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-28 | House | Referred Ways and Means |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {583225/1 Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB86 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Subjects
Communications
Counties
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Forms
Gifts
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Students
Counties
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Emergencies
Equipment
Forms
Gifts
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Job Training
Liability
Medical Treatments
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Private Schools
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
School Administration
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 426.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 7 | 426.7 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |