MD SB181 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor to include an appropriation of $1,000,000 in the annual budget bill for fiscal years 2026 through 2028 to provide operating grants to certain qualifying nonprofit organizations for the purpose of providing training in automotive repair to incarcerated or formerly incarcerated individuals; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to administer the grant funds.
Title
Qualifying Nonprofit Organizations - Training and Reentry Services - Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 111 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (111-23) |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {833324/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2023-10-27 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB488 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-23 - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Certifications
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Job Training
Motor Vehicle Repair
Nonprofit Organizations
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Certifications
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Grants
Job Training
Motor Vehicle Repair
Nonprofit Organizations
Prerelease and Reentry
Public Safety
Revenue and Taxes
Sunset
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 4 | 1013 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |