MD SB186 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-06 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering specified fees for specified alcoholic beverages licenses in Baltimore City; and repealing a provision of law requiring specified licensees in Baltimore City to pay a specified amount each year if they provide live entertainment or outdoor table or cafe service.
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-06 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0186.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0186f.pdf |