MD SB192 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to five the number of regular members of the Harford County Board of Elections; requiring the members of the local board to be of specified political parties; requiring a vacancy on the local board to be filled in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Harford County - Board of Elections - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-26 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |