MD SB192 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law relating to a surviving spouse making an election to take a certain share of the net estate of the decedent; providing that the purpose of the Act is to ensure that the surviving spouse is reasonably provided for during the surviving spouse's lifetime; providing that a surviving spouse may take a certain elective share amount of a certain estate subject to election; establishing the priority to be used in determining the sources from which a certain elective share amount is payable; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Elective Share of Surviving Spouse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Rosenberg) Adopted (135-1) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-08 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2019-04-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {558979/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Attorneys' Fees
Beneficiaries
Circuit Courts
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Divorce
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Inheritance Tax
Insurance
Jurisdiction
Minors
Notaries Public
Notices
Orphans' Court
Parents and Guardians
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Power of Attorney
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Time
Attorneys' Fees
Beneficiaries
Circuit Courts
Courts
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Divorce
Estates and Trusts
Fiduciaries
Forms
Inheritance Tax
Insurance
Jurisdiction
Minors
Notaries Public
Notices
Orphans' Court
Parents and Guardians
Personal Representatives
Petitions
Power of Attorney
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Spouses
Time