MD SB193 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Maryland standard of identity for honey; requiring the standard to be applied to specified products; authorizing the designation of specified products as honey; requiring specified products to be distinguished from pure honey under specified circumstances; authorizing specified persons to file an action to enforce the Act in a specified court; authorizing the court to order specified relief under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Agriculture - Maryland Standard of Identity for Honey
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Richard Madaleno [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable with Amendments 500611/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-24 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-31 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2012-02-22 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable with Amendments 214935/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-20 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agriculture, Department of
Attorney General
Bees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Damages
Food
Labeling
Names
Attorney General
Bees
Circuit Courts
Civil Actions
Consumer Protection
Damages
Food
Labeling
Names