MD SB195 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, instead of authorizing, the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to refer a certain violation of law or breach of professional standards to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-03-28SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-03-28SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {616286/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-03-16HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFloor Amendment {143927/1 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {777272/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-01-25SenateHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0195&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0195f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0195t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0195e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0195_14392701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0195_77727201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0005/sb0195_61628601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb0195.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0195_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0533.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0195_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0951.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0827.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback