MD SB196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an application for a license, an identification card, or a moped operator's permit to allow an applicant to indicate the applicant's sex as female, male, or unspecified or other; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to ensure that the license, identification card, or moped operator's permit of an applicant who indicates that the applicant's sex is unspecified or other displays an "X" in the location on the license, identification card, or permit that indicates the applicant's sex; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operator's Permits - Indication of Applicant's Sex
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-49) (Y: 90 N: 50 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-49) |
2019-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-11 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {528170/1 Judicial Proceedings Report Adopted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Special Order until 2/20 (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment {528170/1 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {528170/1 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Data
Drivers' Licenses
Evidence
Forms
Gender
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Drivers' Licenses
Evidence
Forms
Gender
Identification
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motorcycles, Mopeds and Motor Scooters
Records
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration