MD SB204 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program to support students who are pursuing an education in programs that are directly relevant to cybersecurity; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance to administer the Program; specifying certain eligibility requirements for an applicant to the Program; authorizing a certain scholarship award to be used at any eligible institution to pay for certain education expenses; requiring a scholarship recipient to maintain a certain grade point average; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Cybersecurity Public Service Scholarship Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (29-14) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (29-14) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415 |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#2-3) Adopted |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1) Adopted (29-14) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {574437/1 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Cybersecurity
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
Students
Teachers
Time
Budgets
Cybersecurity
Governor
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Employees
Students
Teachers
Time