MD SB204 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-20 - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing for a clerk of a circuit court and a register of wills vesting rights and a retirement allowance in the Employees' Pension System after accruing at least 8 years of eligibility service; etc.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Vesting and Retirement Allowance - Clerk of the Court and Register of Wills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923126/1 Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1236 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-15 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Clerks of Court
Registers of Wills
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Registers of Wills
Retirement
State Employees
State Government - Pensions and Retirement
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 23 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 29 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |