MD SB214 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-15 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-15 - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning June 1, 2021, the computation of the earned rate of contribution to be calculated using Table A of unemployment insurance rates; and terminating the Act on the date that is 1 year from the date on which the state of emergency declared by the Governor due to the COVID-19 pandemic ends under Title 14 of the Public Safety Article.
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Computation of Earned Rate of Contribution – Applicable Table of Rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 8 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0214?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0214f.pdf |