MD SB217 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-17 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting the lawful repossession of tangible personal property from the Maryland Locksmiths Act.
Title
Maryland Locksmiths Act - Exemptions - Repossession of Property
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |