MD SB22 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an exception to the prohibition against wearing, carrying, or transporting a handgun or other regulated firearm for a person who is carrying a specified court order if the handgun is unloaded, the person notifies a specified law enforcement unit that the person is transporting the handgun to the unit in accordance with the order, and the person transports the handgun or firearm directly to the unit.
Title
Criminal Law - Prohibitions on Wearing, Carrying, or Transporting Firearms -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (133-3) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-08 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-08-26 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Counties
Courts
Domestic Violence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Protection Orders
Special Tax Districts
Weapons
Courts
Domestic Violence
Guns
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Protection Orders
Special Tax Districts
Weapons