MD SB224 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB372
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to provide each individual who is released from a correctional facility with a voter registration application and documentation informing the individual that the individual's voting rights have been restored; requiring the State Board of Elections to adopt certain regulations establishing a program to inform eligible voters incarcerated in correctional facilities of upcoming elections and how to exercise the right to vote; etc.
Title
Election Law – Correctional Facilities – Voter Registration and Voting
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-10 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (36-11) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/04 at 11:00 a.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Judicial Proceedings |
2020-10-16 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB372 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
HB222 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
HB222 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Subjects
Absentee and Mail-In Ballots
Absentee and Mail-In Voting
Ballots
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Ex-Offenders
internet
Notices
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Time
Voting
Absentee and Mail-In Voting
Ballots
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Ex-Offenders
internet
Notices
Parole and Probation
Prisoners
Public Information
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Registration
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Signs and Billboards
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 2 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 1 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |