MD SB226 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-07 - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a candidate to seek an immediate injunction against certain violations of the campaign finance laws against a certain campaign finance entity supporting the candidacy of any candidate for the same office.
Title
Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-01 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {874430/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Campaign Financing
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Reports
Communications
Crimes and Punishments
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Fines
Penalties and Sentences
Political Candidates
Reports