MD SB231 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB162
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-21 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Behavioral Health Administration within the Maryland Department of Health, the Maryland Center for School Safety, and the Department of Information Technology jointly to develop and publish a cyber safety guide and training course on safe Internet, social media, and technology usage for certain students, parents, and school employees to be implemented beginning in the 2022-2023 school year; requiring the guide to be posted on certain websites; etc.
Title
Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m. |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-12-29 | Senate | Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB231 (Carry Over) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
HB824 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
HB824 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-29 - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Age
Certifications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fraud
Harassment
Health, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Social Media
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Age
Certifications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Cybersecurity
Data
Death
Discrimination
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Fraud
Harassment
Health, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
internet
Mental and Behavioral Health
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Health
Public Schools
Reports
Safety
Social Media
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0231?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0231f.pdf |