MD SB234 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Delegates Vaughn, Haddaway-Riccio, and Feldman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Delegates Vaughn, Haddaway-Riccio, and Feldman
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Real Estate Commission in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending the termination provisions relating to specified statutory and regulatory authority of the Commission to July 1, 2022; requiring the Commission to include specified information related to Real Estate Guaranty Fund awards in a specified annual report; increasing to $50,000 the amount that a person may recover for each claim against the Guaranty Fund; etc.
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-08 | Delegates Vaughn, Haddaway-Riccio, and Feldman | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-27 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Checks
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Damages
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Licenses
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Restitution
Sunset
Checks
Civil Actions
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Damages
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Licenses
Notices
Real Estate
Real Property
Reports
Restitution
Sunset