MD SB249 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Correcting specified cross-references to the Public Utility Companies Article in the Annotated Code of Maryland to reflect the renaming of the article to be the Public Utilities Article; correcting specified cross-references to Article 29 - Washington Suburban Sanitary District in the Annotated Code of Maryland to reflect the nonsubstantive revision of the article; correcting specified cross-references in the Public Utility Companies Article; and making stylistic changes.
Title
Public Utilities and Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Cross-References
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-02-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (134-1) | |
2010-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-08 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-07 | Returned Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-19 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-02-19 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-02-18 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-01 | Hearing 2/2 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-22 | Re-assigned Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-01-22 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Committees and Commissions
Corrective Legislation
Utilities
Washington Suburban Sanitary District