MD SB249 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-11 - Re-referred Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Comptroller to regulate the operation of slot machines by fraternal, religious, war veterans', and other nonprofit organizations in specified counties; adding Worcester County to the list of counties in which the organizations may own and operate not more than five slot machines under specified circumstances; authorizing the Comptroller to adopt regulations; requiring the Comptroller to set a fee; prohibiting the licensing of slot machines for organizations in specified locations in Ocean City; etc.
Title
Slot Machines for Nonprofit Organizations on the Eastern Shore - Expansion and
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Re-referred Ways and Means | |
2011-04-07 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (38-7) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Comptroller
Counties
Eastern Shore
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Ocean City
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Worcester County
Comptroller
Counties
Eastern Shore
Fees
Gaming
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Ocean City
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Veterans
Worcester County