MD SB25 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-04 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that specified property of a husband and wife that is held as tenants by the entirety and conveyed to a trustee or trustees, and the proceeds of that property, shall retain its immunity from the claims of separate creditors under specified circumstances; providing that specified property continues to have specified immunity from the claims of specified creditors after the death of a specified individual; etc.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Property Held as Tenants by the Entireties - Transfer to
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-20 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-07 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2010-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-01-14 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2009-09-10 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Debt Collection
Estates and Trusts
Judgments
Liability
Marriage
Personal Property
Real Property
Debt Collection
Estates and Trusts
Judgments
Liability
Marriage
Personal Property
Real Property