MD SB25 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the exclusion of taxicab service from the definition of "transit service"; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Service - Contracted Taxicab Service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 716 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {777679/1 Report Adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-10-05 | Senate | Pre-filed |