MD SB25 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB252
Note: Carry Over of previous SB495
Note: Carry Over of previous SB495
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a person charged with reckless or negligent driving must appear in court and may not prepay the fine if the reckless or negligent driving contributed to an accident that resulted in the death of another person.
Title
Reckless and Negligent Driving - Death of Another - Must-Appear Violation (Sherry's and Christian's Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {523122/1 Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-10-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB25 (Carry Over) 2022-03-16 - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
HB7 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB495 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
HB7 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-07 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
SB495 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 21 | 901.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |