MD SB251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County or of a municipal corporation in Anne Arundel County to grant, by law, a tax credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on real property owned and used as a principal residence by an individual who is at least 62 years old and of limited income; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2017; etc.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors of Limited Income
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. James DeGrange [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] |
Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2017-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {683221/1 (Senator Astle) Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {669532/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local
Elderly Persons
Property Tax
Real Property
Salaries and Compensation
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property - Local