MD SB252 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a train or light engine used in the movement of freight in the same rail corridor as a high-speed passenger or commuter train from being operated in the State unless it has at least two crew members; establishing certain penalties; providing that a railroad company is solely responsible for certain actions of its agents or employees; prohibiting a county or municipal corporation from enacting and enforcing more stringent measures; requiring that certain notice be made to the Department of Legislative Services; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-33) (Y: 99 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 4/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-23) (Y: 17 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (27-14) (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed (99-33)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-04-01HouseRereferred to Environment and Transportation
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (27-14)
2019-03-29SenateMotion Special Order until 4/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-23)
2019-03-28SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
2019-03-27SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2019-02-01SenateHearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback