MD SB254 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the time period before a license expires by which the Board of Examiners of Psychologists is required to send a renewal notice to a licensee; requiring the Board, under specified circumstances, to send a renewal notice by electronic means to a specified electronic mail address of a licensee; requiring each licensee to notify the Board in writing of any change in address or electronic mail address within 30 days after the change occurs; etc.
Title
State Board of Examiners of Psychologists - License Renewal
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Paul Pinsky [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 218 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2013-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Psychologists
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Electronic Government
Health Occupations
Licenses
Notices
Psychologists
Telecommunications and Information Technology