MD SB258 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the State's goals for reducing energy consumption in State buildings; requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to update the High Performance Green Building Program to ensure that the Program aligns with certain greenhouse gas emissions reduction goals; requiring the Department of General Services to identify State-owned facilities that are potential candidates for energy performance contracts; etc.
Title
Department of General Services - State Buildings and Facilities - Energy Conservation and Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reductions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-34) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-01 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-9) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-09-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB130 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-03 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Air Pollution
Auditors and Audits
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
General Services, Department of
Inspections
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Records
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Utilities
Auditors and Audits
Building Maintenance and Repair
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Construction
Contracts
Data
Disclosure
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
General Services, Department of
Inspections
Leases and Rent
Procurement
Public Buildings and Facilities
Records
Reports
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Utilities
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 4 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |