MD SB260 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain condition regarding the payment of certain restitution, fines, and fees that a certain supervised individual must satisfy to accrue certain earned compliance credit while under the supervision of the Division of Parole and Probation in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services.
Title
Division of Parole and Probation - Criteria for Earned Compliance Credit - Exception for Supervision Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 98 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-36) |
2024-03-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-23 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB123 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 97
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 6 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Correctional Services | 7 | 702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |