MD SB269 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions under which the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System is required to correct an error that results in a retiree or beneficiary receiving a benefit that differs from the benefit the retiree or beneficiary is entitled to receive.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correction of Errors in Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {273626/1 Withdrawn |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {273626/1 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Special Order until 2/13 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Kittleman) Adopted |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 9:00 a.m. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |