MD SB283 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a reverse mortgage lender to establish an escrow account for the payment of property taxes and insurance; requiring the escrow account to be established in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring the escrow account to allow for monthly collection and deposit of funds; requiring a reverse mortgage lender to send specified notices; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation - Reverse Mortgages - Escrow Accounts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Mortgages
Property Tax
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Insurance
Mortgages
Property Tax