MD SB283 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Referred Economic Matters
Pending: House Economic Matters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Human Services to authorize benefits under the electric universal service program for an electric customer who does not meet the eligibility requirements for the federal Low Income Home Energy Assistance Program and has an annual income at or below 175% of the federal poverty level if the customer is under the age of 67 years, or at or below 200% of the federal poverty level if the customer is at least 67 years old.
Title
Department of Human Services - Electric Universal Service Program - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {913823/1 Adopted |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB138 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-11 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Energy Matters
Federal Aid
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Federal Aid
Human Services, Department of
Poverty
Social Services - Generally
State Aid
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 512.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |