MD SB287 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting a certain applicant for a handgun qualification license from a certain training requirement if the applicant is a certain retired law enforcement officer or a certain active or retired correctional officer, sheriff, or deputy sheriff under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Handgun Qualification License - Training Requirement - Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-04SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-29SenateHearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-01-28SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback