MD SB289 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the eligibility requirements for the Edward T. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program to include specified persons who live outside the State under specified circumstances; repealing an obsolete provision; and repealing a termination provision.
Title
Higher Education - Edward T. Conroy Memorial Scholarship Program - Eligibility
Sponsors
Sen. Education [?] | Sen. Health [?] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-10 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-31 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Ambulances
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Fire Protection
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Militia
Nonresidents
Rescue Squads
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Veterans
Armed Forces
Correctional Officers
Fire Protection
Higher Education
Law Enforcement
Militia
Nonresidents
Rescue Squads
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Veterans