MD SB289 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-26 - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $5,000 to $10,000 a specified penalty for specified violations of the water pollution control law.
Title
Environment - Water Pollution Control - Penalty
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Barry Glassman [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] |
Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | Senate | Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Favorable |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |