MD SB292 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB284
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment to conduct a statewide recycling needs assessment every 10 years; requiring, by April 1, 2024, producers of certain packaging materials to individually or as part of a producer responsibility organization submit a producer responsibility plan to the Department for approval; prohibiting, on or after October 1, 2024, a producer of certain packaging materials from selling or distributing the packaging materials unless the producer has an approved producer responsibility plan; etc.
Title
Environment - Packaging Materials - Producer Responsibility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | Senate | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB292 (Carry Over) 2022-01-28 - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
HB307 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
HB307 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-19 - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Data
Demographics
Drugs
Education
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Food
Housing
Industry and Technology
internet
Liability
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pollution
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Beverage Containers
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Counties
Data
Demographics
Drugs
Education
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fees
Food
Housing
Industry and Technology
internet
Liability
Minorities
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Penalties and Sentences
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pollution
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Information
Public Schools
Recycling
Refuse Disposal
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Residential Property
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Time
Transportation
Weights and Measures
Women
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1702 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1702.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 1707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2409 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Environment | 9 | 2410 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0292?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0292f.pdf |