MD SB299 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creating an exception from motor vehicle registration requirements for golf carts in the community of Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls, St. Mary's County; providing that a person who operates a golf cart in Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls may operate the golf cart only on specified roads, between dawn and dusk, and only if the golf cart is equipped with specified lighting; authorizing the St. Mary's County Department of Public Works and Transportation to designate the specified highways on which a person may operate a golf cart; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Exception for Golf Carts - Golden Beach Patuxent Knolls
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-0) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (35-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2017-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {360715/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Drivers' Licenses
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
St. Mary's County
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Highway Administration, State
Highways
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicle Registration
Motor Vehicles
St. Mary's County
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road