MD SB30 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a study on the implementation of a statewide 3-1-1 system to provide individuals with nonemergency government services, resources, and information, both as a standalone system and as part of a merged system with the statewide 2-1-1 system.
Title
Study on Statewide 2-1-1 and 3-1-1 Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-08 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {183223/1 Adopted |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Reassigned to Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2022-09-09 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Carry Over) 2022-02-09 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
HB138 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
HB138 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules
Subjects
Advertising
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Inspections
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Open Government
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Cybersecurity
Electronic Government
Emergencies
Emergency Management, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Inspections
Job Training
Jurisdiction
Open Government
Public Information
Public Safety
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones