MD SB306 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "agricultural land transfer tax" and defining "total rate of tax" to provide that, for purposes of specified provisions of law concerning the calculation of the agricultural land transfer tax, the tax does not include a specified surcharge; etc.
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-20) (Y: 119 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372 |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-20) |
2016-04-11 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Walker) Adopted |
2016-04-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |