MD SB318 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB267
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Healthy Indoor Air Quality Grant Program in the Maryland Energy Administration; providing that the purpose of the Program is to improve indoor air quality by providing grants to qualified individuals or businesses to install indoor air quality equipment, approved by the Administration, in a home, rental dwelling unit, or commercial building that includes enhanced ventilation and filtration systems, bipolar ionization technologies, or ultraviolet lighting; etc.
Title
Healthy Indoor Air Quality Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {303125/1 Adopted |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
SB267 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Air Pollution
Certifications
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Energy Administration
Equipment
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Certifications
Comptroller
Electronic Government
Energy Administration
Equipment
Income Tax
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 757 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |