MD SB323 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-12 - Veto sustained (0-44)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Carroll County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $25,000,000 in order to finance the construction, improvement, or development of specified public facilities in Carroll County, including water and sewer projects, to finance loans for fire or emergency-related equipment, buildings, and other facilities of volunteer fire departments in the County, and to effect such borrowing by the issuance and sale at public or private sale of its general obligation bonds; etc.
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | Veto sustained (0-44) |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-04-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Carroll County
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Loans
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
Construction
County and Baltimore City Bonds
County Commissioners
Emergencies
Equipment
Fire Protection
Loans
Local Debt (Bond Bills)
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works