MD SB327 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Barbers and the State Board of Cosmetologists (boards) in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to a specified date the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the boards; prohibiting the boards from setting fees for licensing and license renewals that exceed $50; requiring the boards to adopt regulations regarding specified curriculum standards; etc.
Title
State Board of Barbers and State Board of Cosmetologists - Sunset Extension and
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-12 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-06 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-03-09 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-28 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Apprentices
Auditors and Audits
Barbers
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Auditors and Audits
Barbers
Committees and Commissions
Cosmetologists
Education
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Higher Education
Inspections
Licenses
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sunset