MD SB327 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person convicted of prostitution to file a motion to vacate the judgment under specified circumstances; establishing the requirements for a motion filed under the Act; requiring the court to hold a hearing on the motion under specified circumstances, with a specified exception; authorizing the court to take specified actions in ruling on the motion; requiring the court to state on the record the reason for its ruling on the motion; etc.
Title
Human Trafficking Victim Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Richard Colburn [R] | Sen. William Ferguson [D] | Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] |
Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Nancy Jacobs [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-04-09 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Delegates Dumais, Lee, and McDermott | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-08 | House Refuses to Recede | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-03-25 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading Judiciary | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-08 | Conference Committee Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Senators Forehand, Zirkin, and Raskin | |
2011-04-07 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Requests House Recede | |
2011-04-07 | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Expungement
Hearings
Human Rights
Judgments
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Records
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
Expungement
Hearings
Human Rights
Judgments
Notices
Petitions
Prostitution
Records
Restitution
State's Attorneys
Victims