MD SB327 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to repeal a requirement that the Anne Arundel County Board of Education and the Board of Directors of the South River High School Community Partnership, Inc. provide a matching fund for the South River High School Media Center project; providing that the grant may not terminate before June 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Anne Arundel County - South River High School Media Center
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |