MD SB336 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirements for education and experience for licensing of certain insurance producers, including producers for property and casualty insurance, life insurance, health insurance, annuities, and related products.
Title
Insurance - Producer Licensing Requirements - Education and Experience
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2024-02-16 | House | Referred Economic Matters Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {243329/1 Adopted |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-01-15 | Senate | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB265 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-04 - Returned Passed
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Credit
Education
Examinations
Health - Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Job Training
Licenses
Credit
Education
Examinations
Health - Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Job Training
Licenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 10 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 122 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 124 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 10 | 125 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |