MD SB344 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor's Office for Children to establish a workgroup composed of specified representatives to develop a plan for implementation of specified certification; requiring the workgroup to take specified items into consideration in developing the plan; requiring the plan to specify a rate adjustment and recommendations; requiring the Office to report on the workgroup's implementation plan to the Governor and specified legislative committees on or before September 1, 2011; etc.
Title
Residential Child and Youth Care Practitioners - Certification - Implementation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-03-30 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-27 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2011-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendment | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2011-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Laid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-02 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Children, Governor's Office for
Committees and Commissions
Group Homes
Health Occupations
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Reports
Youth
Committees and Commissions
Group Homes
Health Occupations
Juvenile Facilities
Licenses
Mental Health
Minors
Reports
Youth