MD SB345 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing certain standards and requirements for implementing the Vision Zero program under the Maryland Department of Transportation.
Title
Transportation - Vision Zero - Implementation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {423122/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Floor Amendment {993726/1 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-15 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB344 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Accidents
Aging, Department of
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Data
Death
Demographics
Disabilities, Department of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Engineers
General Assembly
Governor
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Highways
Hospitals
Industry and Technology
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Medical Examiners
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Planning, Department of
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Aging, Department of
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Data
Death
Demographics
Disabilities, Department of
Education, State Department of
Emergency Medical Services
Engineers
General Assembly
Governor
Health, Department of
Higher Education
Highways
Hospitals
Industry and Technology
Law Enforcement
Mass Transit
Medical Examiners
Motor Vehicle Operation
Municipal Corporations
Pedestrians
Planning, Department of
Reports
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
Standards and Best Practices
State Highway Administration
State Police, Department of
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Transportation - Highways
Transportation, Department of
Trucks
Urban Areas
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 8 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 1003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 1007 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 8 | 1008 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |