MD SB35 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that a specified law enforcement unit provide a copy of a specified domestic violence incident report to the Department of State Police.
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence Incident Report - Dissemination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-26 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2013-10-23 | Senate | Pre-filed |