MD SB355 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to reconvene the Abuser Registry Workgroup; requiring the Abuser Registry Workgroup to undertake a specified review, monitor the implementation of specified recommendations, and recommend specified changes; requiring the Office to submit a report to the Governor and specified legislative committees on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Office of Health Care Quality - Abuser Registry Workgroup
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 239 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {327971/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Job Training
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Job Training
Privacy
Public Health
Records
Registration
Reports
Sunset
Victims
Work, Labor and Employment