MD SB356 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the County Commissioners of Somerset County to appropriate to certain organized volunteer fire companies in the county certain amounts for certain fiscal years; and requiring that the appropriations required for a certain fiscal year remain in effect for subsequent fiscal years unless altered by a future enactment.
Title
Somerset County - Fire Companies - Appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {850717/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |