MD SB361 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voiding a provision of a specified contract or agreement that attempts or purports to waive specified rights or reduce specified liability as against public policy; providing for the treatment of specified information relating to a chemical constituent used in hydraulic fracturing for the purposes of specified action; requiring a permittee to file with the Department of the Environment and a specified local health department documentation stating the composition of the injection fluid used for hydraulic fracturing of the well; etc.
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-30 | House | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-22 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-5) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senators Zirkin and Edwards) {503325/1 Adopted |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 Withdrawn |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Edwards) {213627/1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Special Order until 3/10 (Senator Edwards) Adopted |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {268372/1 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Contracts
Courts
Damages
Death
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Negligence
Real Property
Records
Wells
Civil Actions and Procedures
Contracts
Courts
Damages
Death
Environment, Department of
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fuel
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Insurance
Liability
Licenses
Negligence
Real Property
Records
Wells