MD SB364 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing an individual to resume participation in the Alternate Contributory Pension Selection in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System if the individual has been separated from employment for more than 4 years, by June 30, 2011, has accrued the minimum amount of eligibility service needed to be eligible for a vested allowance, and by June 30, 2016, has returned to employment in a position included in the Employees' Pension System or Teachers' Pension System; providing for the retroactive application of the Act.
Title
Alternate Contributory Pension Selection - Return to Employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-22) (Y: 115 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 163 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2015-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-22) |
2015-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129038/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Public Employees
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment
Retirement Systems
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Work, Labor and Employment